Home Articles Veda Vedic Mathematics Lesson - Ekadhikena Purvena

# Vedic Mathematics Lesson – Ekadhikena Purvena

Earlier I had written an article on the Origin and History of Modern Mathematics, followed up by a simple lesson on instant Multiplication using Vedic Mathematics.

In this article we will learn about yet another simple but powerful Sutra (formula) of Vedic Mathematics called

Ekadhikena Purvena in Sanskrit means “One more than the previous“.

So in mathematical calculations involving this formula, we generally consider the given number and another number whose value is one greater than the given number.

Ekadhikena Purvena sutra can be used to quickly multiply any two numbers of two digits (say AB and AC) whose

1. First digits are the same and (A=A)
2. The second digits add up to 10 (B+C=10)

For example to multiply 47 x 43, here is how we go about it.

1. Take the first digit which is common in both numbers, in the above case 4
2. Apply Ekadhikena to it – i.e. increment it by one. So it becomes 5.
3. Now write down the product of 5×4 which is 20.
4. Next write down the product of the other two digits which is 7×3=21

How simple isnt it? You dont even require a pencil and paper, nor do you require to do any carrying over of remainders.

Let us consider another example. To multiply 51×59. The answer is

1. 5 x (5+1) = 5×6 =30
2. 1×9=9
3. For the second part we need to round it to two digits in case it is just a single digit, hence it becomes 09
4. So the answer is 3009

## Ekadhikena Purvena in Finding Squares

The above method can also easily be implemented to find the squares of numbers ending with five, because the sum of their last two digits is 5+5 which is 10, which hence meets the requirement of the formula.

So to find 75×75, all we need to do is 7×8,5×5 which is 5625. Instant calculation, isn’t it?

## Ekadhikena Purvena in Converting Fractions to Decimals

How easy it is to calculate the recurring decimal of fractions like 1/19 whose denominators end with 9? Using Ekadhikena Purvena this calculation becomes as simple as… well, seeing is believing here

Consider 1/19

1. Take 1 which is the “Purvena” (The digit previous to 9).
2. Increase it by one which makes it 2
3.  Now start with 1 and go on multiplying it by 2 as follows:
• 1
• 21 which is [2×1,1]
• 421 which is [2×2,21]
• 8421 which is [2×4,421]
• 68421 which is [2×8,8421]. We now have one carrying since 2×8=16
• 368421  which is [(2×6)+1,68421]. We now have one carrying since (2×6)+1=13
• 7368421  which is [(2×3)+1,368421]
• 47368421 which is [(7×2),7368421]. We now have one carrying since (2×7)=14
• 947368421 which is [(4×2)+1,47368421]

Ok we should now stop here. Why?
Well, we have figured out half of the digits in the answer. And finding the remaining half is even more simpler.

But before that, how did we find that we were done with half of the answer?

The rule is, take the denomination and remove 1 from it. So 19-1=18. Now this gives us the total number of digits in the complete answer for 1/19. And since we have now found 9 digits we are half way through the answer.

For the remaining half simply find the inverse of each digit in the so far discovered half. Inverse of a digit is that digit which makes the total of the two 9. So inverse of 1 is 8, 2 is 7 and so on till 9 is 0.

The inverse of 947368421 hence is 052631578. Ok now that we have both the halves of the answer. The complete answer is just stick the two together after a decimal, which is 0.052631578947368421

Simple isn’t it? If you dont find this simple, then try calculating 1/19 using the traditional method taught in the schools :)

Even the normal calculators will not give you such an accurate decimal representation of these fractions, and most importantly with little practice you can simply go on writing down the digits in the answer from right to left without the need of any additional worksheet.

Now one might wonder the need to remember so many different formula for different calculations. Just imagine what if you were taught these kind of calculations right  from your school days. Well, expertise is after all all about getting used what we regulary do.

Its not as if in the schools we were taught one or two methods of doing calculations. We as students, even otherwise had to learn numerous methods of computations. So if learning these vedic mathematical lessons is going to help us do lightning fast calculations without using calculators, then why not?

Vedic Mathematics – by Sri Bharati Krisna Tirthaji  Gurudevhttps://www.hitxp.com
Gurudev is the developer of Gurunudi AI Platform. This is his official website where he pens his thoughts on a wide range of topics, answers queries, shares resources and tools developed by him.

1. gaurav kumar

why dont our education policy based on our ancient vedas and purnas. there is so much to learn. this is main source of advaced technology

2. ajay

i wish i too had been taught this wonderful vedic calculations

3. Shama Kulkarni

very nice ! easy

• Anonymous

Thanks.

4. Deepankar Rawat

Hello Sir,
We want to contact you to invite you as a dignitary in International Youth Conference in Uttarakhand. It will be of great help, if you could please provide us some information about you.
http://150.youthariseawake.org/
http://www.vsmpantnagar.org/

5. Deepankar Rawat

Hello Sir,
We want to contact you to invite you as a dignitary in International Youth Conference in Uttarakhand. It will be of great help, if you could please provide us some information about you.
http://150.youthariseawake.org/
http://www.vsmpantnagar.org/

• Anonymous

Thank you very much for your kind invitation. I apologize for the huge delay in replying. Wish the event a great success.

6. N R Kaushik

Can you clarify the following two multiplications :-
19 * 11
91 * 99

• Sounder Dilipan

9*1=09
1*2=2
ans:209

1*9=09
9*9=81
ans:8109

• Sounder Dilipan

for the second one I meant

1*9=09
9*10=90
ans:9009

7. Prashanth

I was just thinking if Vedic Math techniques can be used to do the computations in calculators or computers.Will it be anyway faster than present day computers? If there are significant advantages then I think Vedic Math will find its rightful place in the world.

• Anonymous

Given the fact that processors are already fast enough, the difference may not be obvious in normal circumstances. But in instances like say math intensive code in game engines, 3D rendering, mathematical software etc I guess there will be a definite speed gain. However because of the numerous methods available depending on the type of the problem, I guess the size of the software will be larger in case of using vedic mathematics because the lines of programming logic will be more here. So if we were to allow for an increase in software size, then I guess vedic mathematics should definitely show a speed gain in math intensive calculations.

8. Mayank

Very nice. How easy it would have been if we were taught vedic mathematics instead of the current mathematics in our schools.

• Anonymous

Wish atleast the present and future generations will start learning them at an early age and make good use of it.

Instagram
Pinterest
Sound Cloud

### The Power of Democracy: How Free Societies Foster Innovation in Science and Technology

Democracy allows freedom of speech and thought, boosting creativity and innovation. This leads to scientific breakthroughs and technological advancements.

### How does GOD helps us?

Do prayers really help? Do miracles happen when we are in trouble? Does God really help us in times of need? Are prayers enough to save us during bad times? How should we face problems?

### Sanskrit poem on Ramayana – read in reverse becomes Mahabharata!

A Sanskrit poem about Ramayana when read in reverse direction becomes a poem on Mahabharata!

### The difference between Itihasa and Puranas

Documentation of ancient Indian history and the historical events of Indian civilization in the form of Itihasa and Puranas - Ramayana and Mahabharata.

### Jai Shri Ram – Adipurush – Piano Notations

Piano, Keyboard, Violin, Flute notes, Guitar Tabs and Sheet Music of the Song Jai Shri Ram from the 2023 Hindi movie Adipurush in Western and Indian Notations.

### Sojugada Soojumallige – Garuda Gamana Vrishabha Vahana – Piano Notations

Piano, Keyboard, Violin, Flute notes, Guitar Tabs and Sheet Music of the Song Sojugada Soojumallige from the 2021 Kannada movie Garuda Gamana Vrishabha Vahana in Western and Indian Notations.

### Oo Antava Mava – Pushpa – Piano Notations

Piano, Keyboard, Violin, Flute notes, Guitar Tabs and Sheet Music of the Song Oo Antava Mava from the 2022 Telugu movie Pushpa in Western and Indian Notations.

### Kaa Chalige Bangalore (Tiningaa Miningaa Tishaaaa) – Salaga – Piano Notations

Piano, Keyboard, Violin, Flute notes, Guitar Tabs and Sheet Music of the Song Tiningaa Miningaa Tishaaaa (Kaa Chali Ge) from the 2022 Kannada movie Salaga in Western and Indian Notations.